PA HB26 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-10)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 91
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-10)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 91
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, further providing for antique, classic and collectible plates and for special registration plates, providing for distracted driving awareness plate, further providing for special plates for veterans and providing for special plates for recipients of Soldier's Medal, for special plates for recipients of Presidential Service Badge and for special plates for veterans of an ally foreign country; and, in fees, further providing for exemption of persons, entities and vehicles from fees and for fee for local use.
Title
In registration of vehicles, further providing for antique, classic and collectible plates and for special registration plates, providing for distracted driving awareness plate, further providing for special plates for veterans and providing for special plates for recipients of Soldier's Medal, for special plates for recipients of Presidential Service Badge and for special plates for veterans of an ally foreign country; and, in fees, further providing for exemption of persons, entities and vehicles from fees and for fee for local use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 26 PN 4146, CONCUR (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 26 PN 4146, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 26 PN 2010, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01656 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01656 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 26 PN 4146, CONCUR (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 26 PN 4146, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 26 PN 2010, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01656 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01656 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | House | Act No. 91 |
2018-10-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (187-0) |
2018-10-17 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-10-17 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-10-16 | House | In the House |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-1) |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2017-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-26 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-14 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-14 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |