PA HB2599 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-14 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-14 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for legal effect of surplus personal property disposed of by municipal officials and employees in support of the Ukrainian Government during 2022.
Title
Providing for legal effect of surplus personal property disposed of by municipal officials and employees in support of the Ukrainian Government during 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2599 PN 3115, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2599 PN 3115, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-06-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-06-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-08 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-07 | House | Removed from table |
2022-05-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-05-25 | House | First consideration |
2022-05-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-05-16 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |