PA HB2573 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 30 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-09-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on May 30 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-09-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 21, 1943 (P.L.571, No.254), known as The Fourth to Eighth Class and Selective County Assessment Law, further providing for removal permits, transfer of ownership certificates and tax lien certificates of mobilehomes and trailers; and imposing a penalty.
Title
An Act amending the act of May 21, 1943 (P.L.571, No.254), known as The Fourth to Eighth Class and Selective County Assessment Law, further providing for removal permits, transfer of ownership certificates and tax lien certificates of mobilehomes and trailers; and imposing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-09-15 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-09-15 | Removed from table | |
2008-09-15 | Laid on the table | |
2008-09-15 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-06-04 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2008-06-04 | First consideration | |
2008-06-04 | Reported as committed | |
2008-05-30 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2573 |