PA HB2552 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for temporary services to aging-out individuals through county agencies; and imposing duties on county agencies and the Department of Human Services.
Title
Providing for temporary services to aging-out individuals through county agencies; and imposing duties on county agencies and the Department of Human Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-20 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-17 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-10 | House | Second consideration |
2020-06-09 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-27 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-05-26 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |