PA HB2536 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-10-10 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-10-10 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act repealing the act of December 14, 1967 (P.L.746, No.345), known as the Savings Association Code of 1967, eliminating provisions for incorporation and organization, for names, for offices, for directors, officers, employees and attorneys, for members, for corporate powers, for savings operations, earnings, account insurance and reserves, for investment operations, for amendment of articles, for mergers, consolidations, conversions and reorganizations, for voluntary and involuntary dissolution and distribution of assets upon insolvency, for foreign and Federal associations, for provisions applicable to Department of Banking and for penalties and criminal provisions.
Title
Repealing the act of December 14, 1967 (P.L.746, No.345), known as the Savings Association Code of 1967, eliminating provisions for incorporation and organization, for names, for offices, for directors, officers, employees and attorneys, for members, for corporate powers, for savings operations, earnings, account insurance and reserves, for investment operations, for amendment of articles, for mergers, consolidations, conversions and reorganizations, for voluntary and involuntary dissolution and distribution of assets upon insolvency, for foreign and Federal associations, for provisions applicable to Department of Banking and for penalties and criminal provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-03 - House - HB 2536 PN 3931, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-10 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2012-10-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-10-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2012-10-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-10-02 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-10-02 | House | Second consideration |
2012-10-01 | House | Removed from table |
2012-09-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-09-25 | House | First consideration |
2012-09-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2012-08-06 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 3931 |
2012-07-02 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |