PA HB2526 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-10)
Status: Engrossed on October 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-15 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-15 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sexual offenses, providing for the offense of female mutilation.
Title
In sexual offenses, providing for the offense of female mutilation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Floor: HB 2526 PN 3800, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Floor: HB 2526 PN 3800, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-10-12 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2018-10-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-10-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2018-10-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-01 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-01 | House | Second consideration |
2018-09-25 | House | Removed from table |
2018-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-09-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-22 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2018-06-22 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-06-21 | House | Referred to HEALTH |