PA HB2509 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Pending: Senate Aging & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing the Long-Term Care Facility Personal Protective Equipment Reimbursement Grant Program and imposing duties on the Department of Aging.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Long-Term Care Facility Personal Protective Equipment Reimbursement Grant Program and imposing duties on the Department of Aging.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2509 PN 3852, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A05851 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-17SenateReferred to AGING AND YOUTH
2020-06-10SenateIn the Senate
2020-06-10HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2020-06-10HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-06-09HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-09HouseSecond consideration
2020-05-28HouseRemoved from table
2020-05-26HouseLaid on the table
2020-05-26HouseFirst consideration
2020-05-26HouseReported as amended
2020-05-13HouseReferred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2509
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2509&pn=3747
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2509&pn=3852
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=05/26/2020&RollCallId=2164
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=05/26/2020&RollCallId=2165
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1414
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/10/2020&RollCallId=2212

Bill Comments

feedback