PA HB2485 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-24 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-24 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 14, 2008 (P.L.6, No.3), known as the Right-to-Know Law, in State contract information, further providing for submission and retention of contracts.
Title
In State contract information, further providing for submission and retention of contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Seth Grove [R] | Rep. Brian Smith [R] | Rep. Donald Cook [R] | Rep. Francis Ryan [R] |
Rep. Mike Jones [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Stanley Saylor [R] | Rep. David Rowe [R] |
Rep. John Lawrence [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2485 PN 3163, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 2485 PN 3057, 2021 A4305 (Y: 198 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04094 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2485 PN 3163, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 2485 PN 3057, 2021 A4305 (Y: 198 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04094 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-24 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2022-06-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2022-06-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-06-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-05-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-05-25 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-27 | House | First consideration |
2022-04-27 | House | Reported as amended |
2022-04-05 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |