PA HB2473 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-28 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-28 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in taxicabs and limousines in first class cities, establishing a Taxicab Medallion Account and Limousine Account within the Philadelphia Taxicab and Limousine Regulatory Fund; and further providing for budget and assessments, for funds and for fees.
Title
In taxicabs and limousines in first class cities, establishing a Taxicab Medallion Account and Limousine Account within the Philadelphia Taxicab and Limousine Regulatory Fund; and further providing for budget and assessments, for funds and for fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Godshall [R] | Rep. Gary Day [R] | Rep. Sheryl Delozier [R] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] |
Rep. Marcia Hahn [R] | Rep. Susan Helm [R] | Rep. Dawn Keefer [R] | Rep. Curtis Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 2473 PN 4051, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A09029 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2473 PN 3777, 2017 A8897, DONATUCCI (Y: 91 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2473 PN 3777, 2017 A8902, DONATUCCI (Y: 86 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2473 PN 3777, 2017 A8888, GODSHALL (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A07648 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A09029 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2473 PN 3777, 2017 A8897, DONATUCCI (Y: 91 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2473 PN 3777, 2017 A8902, DONATUCCI (Y: 86 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2473 PN 3777, 2017 A8888, GODSHALL (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A07648 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2018-09-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-09-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2018-09-24 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2018-06-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-22 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-20 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2018-06-20 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-20 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-06-07 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |