PA HB2470 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2012 - 50% progression
Action: 2012-11-14 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in permit extensions, further providing for existing approval.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In permit extensions, further providing for existing approval.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-10-15 - House - HB 2470 PN 4188, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-03 - House - HB 2470 PN 3738, 2011 A12327, MIRABITO (Y: 94 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2012-10-03 - House - HB 2470 PN 3738, 2011 A13298, EVANKOVICH (Y: 192 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-11-14SenateReferred to FINANCE
2012-10-15SenateIn the Senate
2012-10-15HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-0)
2012-10-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2012-10-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2012-10-03HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2012-10-02HouseRemoved from table
2012-09-24HouseLaid on the table
2012-09-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2012-06-20HouseRe-committed to RULES
2012-06-20HouseFirst consideration
2012-06-20HouseReported as committed
2012-06-13HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback