PA HB247 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 51 (Military Affairs) and 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Department of Military and Veterans Affairs, further providing for Pennsylvania Veterans' Memorial Trust Fund; in State Veterans' Commission and Deputy Adjutant General for Veterans' Affairs, further providing for Veterans' Trust Fund; in Pennsylvania Veterans' Memorial Commission, repealing provisions relating to the Pennsylvania Veterans' Memorial Trust Fund and to expiration; and, in registration of vehicles, further providing for Pennsylvania monument registration plate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Department of Military and Veterans Affairs, further providing for Pennsylvania Veterans' Memorial Trust Fund; in State Veterans' Commission and Deputy Adjutant General for Veterans' Affairs, further providing for Veterans' Trust Fund; in Pennsylvania Veterans' Memorial Commission, repealing provisions relating to the Pennsylvania Veterans' Memorial Trust Fund and to expiration; and, in registration of vehicles, further providing for Pennsylvania monument registration plate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Floor: HB 247 PN 209, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-18SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-13SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-13SenateReported as committed
2017-03-24SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2017-03-21SenateIn the Senate
2017-03-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-0)
2017-03-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-03-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-03-20HouseSecond consideration
2017-03-13HouseRemoved from table
2017-02-07HouseLaid on the table
2017-02-07HouseFirst consideration
2017-02-07HouseReported as committed
2017-01-31HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=247
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0247&pn=0209
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=02/07/2017&RollCallId=38
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=98
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/21/2017&RollCallId=162
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=06/13/2018&RollCallId=947

Bill Comments

feedback