PA HB2412 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 8 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-10-18 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for interagency cooperation regarding employee misclassification; and establishing the Employee Misclassification Working Group.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for interagency cooperation regarding employee misclassification; and establishing the Employee Misclassification Working Group.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-10-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-10-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2412 PN 3390, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 116 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A05091 (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-10-18SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2024-10-08SenateIn the Senate
2024-10-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (116-85)
2024-10-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2024-10-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2024-10-07HouseSecond consideration
2024-10-02HouseRemoved from table
2024-09-23HouseLaid on the table
2024-09-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2024-06-25HouseRe-committed to RULES
2024-06-25HouseFirst consideration
2024-06-25HouseReported as amended
2024-06-12HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2023&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2412
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2412&pn=3310
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2412&pn=3390
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2023/0/HB2412P3390.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/25/2024&RollCallId=2051
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/25/2024&RollCallId=2052
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1519
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=62&theDate=10/08/2024&RollCallId=2517

Bill Comments

feedback