PA HB2400 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 50-5)
Status: Passed on October 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-25 - Act No. 202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for definitions, for exceptions to prohibition of interception and disclosure of communications, for possession, sale, distribution, manufacture or advertisement of electronic, mechanical or other devices, for issuance of order and effect; providing for target-specific orders; and further providing for emergency hostage and barricade situations, for investigative disclosure or use of contents of wire, electronic or oral communications or derivative evidence, for requirements for governmental access, for cost reimbursement, for mobile tracking devices, for application for an order for use of certain devices and for issuance of an order for use of certain devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for exceptions to prohibition of interception and disclosure of communications, for possession, sale, distribution, manufacture or advertisement of electronic, mechanical or other devices, for issuance of order and effect; providing for target-specific orders; and further providing for emergency hostage and barricade situations, for investigative disclosure or use of contents of wire, electronic or oral communications or derivative evidence, for requirements for governmental access, for cost reimbursement, for mobile tracking devices, for application for an order for use of certain devices and for issuance of an order for use of certain devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-10-17 - House - HB 2400 PN 4083, CONCUR (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - HB 2400 PN 4083, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-25 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - HB 2400 PN 3728, FP (Y: 145 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - HB 2400 PN 3662, 2011 A11198, DEPASQUALE (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-25HouseAct No. 202
2012-10-25HouseApproved by the Governor
2012-10-18HousePresented to the Governor
2012-10-18HouseSigned in Senate
2012-10-17HouseSigned in House
2012-10-17HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (191-0)
2012-10-17HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2012-10-17HouseReferred to RULES
2012-10-17HouseIn the House
2012-10-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2012-10-16SenateSecond consideration
2012-10-15SenateRe-reported as committed
2012-10-01SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2012-09-25SenateFirst consideration
2012-09-25SenateReported as amended
2012-06-15SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2012-06-13SenateIn the Senate
2012-06-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (145-52)
2012-06-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2012-06-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2012-06-12HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2012-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2012-06-05HouseRe-committed to RULES
2012-06-05HouseFirst consideration
2012-06-05HouseReported as amended
2012-05-21HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2011&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2400
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2400&pn=3573
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2400&pn=3662
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2400&pn=3728
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2400&pn=4083
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1562
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1593
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2011&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=09/25/2012&rNbr=1204
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2011&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/15/2012&rNbr=1304
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=887
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=2015

Bill Comments

feedback