PA HB2397 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 35-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the provision or sale of Pennsylvania milk in Pennsylvania schools.
Title
Authorizing the provision or sale of Pennsylvania milk in Pennsylvania schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2397 PN 2843, FP (Y: 196 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2397 PN 2843, FP (Y: 196 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2022-04-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-04-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-2) |
2022-04-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-12 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-12 | House | Second consideration |
2022-04-11 | House | Removed from table |
2022-03-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-03-30 | House | First consideration |
2022-03-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |