PA HB2377 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Passed on October 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-31 - Act No. 203
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Passed on October 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-31 - Act No. 203
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for definitions and for laws suspended during emergency assignments.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for laws suspended during emergency assignments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-08 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-07 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-07 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Act No. 203 |
2014-10-31 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-23 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-20 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (196-0) |
2014-10-15 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-15 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-15 | House | In the House |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-10-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2014-09-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-09-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (187-0) |
2014-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-09-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-16 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-09-15 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-07-02 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-07-02 | House | First consideration |
2014-07-02 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-06-24 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |