PA HB2367 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-18 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-18 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for duty of Department of Environmental Protection to prohibit the construction or installation of wind turbines that negatively affect military installations.
Title
Providing for duty of Department of Environmental Protection to prohibit the construction or installation of wind turbines that negatively affect military installations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Floor: HB 2367 PN 3345, FP (Y: 189 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2367 PN 3295, 2021 A5230 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A04985 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Floor: HB 2367 PN 3345, FP (Y: 189 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2367 PN 3295, 2021 A5230 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A04985 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-10-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-07-05 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2022-07-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-07-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-11) |
2022-07-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-30 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-06-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-22 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2022-06-22 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |