PA HB2357 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act prohibiting the sale or distribution of kratom products to individuals younger than 18 years of age; providing for duties of Department of Health; and imposing penalties.
Title
Prohibiting the sale or distribution of kratom products to individuals younger than 18 years of age; providing for duties of Department of Health; and imposing penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2357 PN 3233, FP (Y: 197 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A04340 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2357 PN 3233, FP (Y: 197 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A04340 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-10-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-10-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-10-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2022-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-3) |
2022-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-22 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-13 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2022-06-13 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred to HEALTH |