PA HB2353 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on October 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-14 - Act No. 144
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on October 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-14 - Act No. 144
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.789, No.285), known as The Insurance Department Act of 1921, in suspension of business - involuntary dissolutions, further providing for definitions, for injunctions and orders, for fraudulent transfers prior to petition and for voidable preferences and liens.
Title
In suspension of business - involuntary dissolutions, further providing for definitions, for injunctions and orders, for fraudulent transfers prior to petition and for voidable preferences and liens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-14 | Senate | Act No. 144 |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-09 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-09-16 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2014-07-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-07-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2014-06-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-27 | House | Second consideration |
2014-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-25 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-25 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-06-17 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |