PA HB2349 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Act No. 118
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Act No. 118
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act redesignating the bridge on State Route 322 over North Fork Creek in Brookville Borough, Jefferson County, as the Purple Heart Memorial Bridge of Jefferson County.
Title
Redesignating the bridge on State Route 322 over North Fork Creek in Brookville Borough, Jefferson County, as the Purple Heart Memorial Bridge of Jefferson County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-29 - Senate - HB 2349 PN 3476, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - HB 2349 PN 3476, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - HB 2349 PN 3476, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-05 | Senate | Act No. 118 |
2012-07-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2012-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2012-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2012-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2012-06-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2012-06-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-06-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-06-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2012-06-15 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2012-06-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-06-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2012-06-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-06-12 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-06-12 | House | Second consideration |
2012-06-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-06-05 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2012-06-05 | House | First consideration |
2012-06-05 | House | Reported as committed |
2012-05-07 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |