PA HB2342 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-08 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-08 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the concurrence of the Department of Environmental Protection, to lease submerged lands in excess of 25 acres within Erie County, for the assessment, development, construction and operation of utility scale offshore wind, solar or kinetic energy generation facilities.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the concurrence of the Department of Environmental Protection, to lease submerged lands in excess of 25 acres within Erie County, for the assessment, development, construction and operation of utility scale offshore wind, solar or kinetic energy generation facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. John Evans [R] | Rep. Florindo Fabrizio [D] | Rep. Patrick Harkins [D] | Rep. John Hornaman [D] |
Rep. William Kortz [D] | Rep. Curtis Sonney [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-25 - House - HB 2342 PN 3702, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2010-05-25 | In the Senate | |
2010-05-25 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-05-24 | Second consideration | |
2010-05-24 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-05-04 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-05-04 | Removed from table | |
2010-05-03 | Laid on the table | |
2010-05-03 | First consideration | |
2010-05-03 | Reported as amended | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |