PA HB2321 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 44-13)
Status: Passed on November 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-23 - Act No. 118
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 44-13)
Status: Passed on November 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-23 - Act No. 118
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 4 (Amusements), 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, consolidating the Public Safety Emergency Telephone Act; further providing for definitions, for the Wireless E-911 Emergency Services Fund and for funding for support; providing for a legislative study and for termination; consolidating statutory provisions relating to firefighters, the State Fire Commissioner and grants to fire companies and other services; making editorial changes; and making related repeals.
Title
Consolidating the Public Safety Emergency Telephone Act; further providing for definitions, for the Wireless E-911 Emergency Services Fund and for funding for support; providing for a legislative study and for termination; consolidating statutory provisions relating to firefighters, the State Fire Commissioner and grants to fire companies and other services; making editorial changes; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-11-15 - House - HB 2321 PN 4469, CONCUR (Y: 194 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-13 - Senate - HB 2321 PN 4469, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-28 - House - HB 2321 PN 3346, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-13 - Senate - HB 2321 PN 4469, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-28 - House - HB 2321 PN 3346, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-23 | Act No. 118 | |
2010-11-23 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-11-17 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-11-17 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-11-15 | Signed in House | |
2010-11-15 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2010-11-15 | Reported as committed | |
2010-10-18 | Referred to RULES | |
2010-10-13 | In the House | |
2010-10-13 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-10-12 | Second consideration | |
2010-10-12 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-09-29 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-09-29 | First consideration | |
2010-09-29 | Reported as amended | |
2010-09-29 | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS | |
2010-09-28 | In the Senate | |
2010-09-28 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-09-27 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-27 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-09-14 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-09-14 | Removed from table | |
2010-09-13 | Laid on the table | |
2010-09-13 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-06-24 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2010-06-24 | First consideration | |
2010-06-24 | Reported as committed | |
2010-03-12 | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |