PA HB231 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in minors, further providing for the offense of unlawful contact with minor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In minors, further providing for the offense of unlawful contact with minor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 231 PN 195, FP (Y: 184 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 231 PN 195, MOT TABLE, HARRIS (Y: 90 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 231 PN 195, 2021 A735, MOT TABLE, KAUFFMAN (Y: 111 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-28SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2021-05-25SenateIn the Senate
2021-05-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (184-17)
2021-05-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-05-24HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-05-24HouseSecond consideration
2021-05-05HouseRemoved from table
2021-04-20HouseLaid on the table
2021-04-20HouseFirst consideration
2021-04-20HouseReported as committed
2021-01-25HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=231
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0231&pn=0195
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0231P0195.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=04/20/2021&RollCallId=327
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=218
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=219
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=233
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/25/2021&RollCallId=476

Bill Comments

feedback