PA HB2304 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-24 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-24 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 51 (Military Affairs) and 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Department of Military and Veterans' Affairs, further providing for Pennsylvania Veterans' Memorial Trust Fund; in State Veterans' Commission and Deputy Adjutant General for Veterans' Affairs, further providing for Veterans' Trust Fund; in Pennsylvania Veterans' Memorial Commission, repealing provisions relating to the Pennsylvania Veterans' Memorial Trust Fund and to expiration; and, in registration of vehicles, further providing for Pennsylvania monument registration plate.
Title
In Department of Military and Veterans' Affairs, further providing for Pennsylvania Veterans' Memorial Trust Fund; in State Veterans' Commission and Deputy Adjutant General for Veterans' Affairs, further providing for Veterans' Trust Fund; in Pennsylvania Veterans' Memorial Commission, repealing provisions relating to the Pennsylvania Veterans' Memorial Trust Fund and to expiration; and, in registration of vehicles, further providing for Pennsylvania monument registration plate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: HB 2304 PN 3806, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: HB 2304 PN 3806, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2016-10-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-10-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2016-10-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-17 | House | Second consideration |
2016-09-28 | House | Removed from table |
2016-09-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-09-21 | House | First consideration |
2016-09-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-09-02 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |