PA HB2303 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-31 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-31 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, providing for revocable trusts treated as part of estate.
Title
In personal income tax, providing for revocable trusts treated as part of estate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 2303 PN 3458, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-31 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2018-10-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-10-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-0) |
2018-10-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-16 | House | Second consideration |
2018-10-15 | House | Removed from table |
2018-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-09-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-20 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2018-06-20 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-04-30 | House | Referred to FINANCE |