PA HB2278 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 173
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 173
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for operators of unconventional wells to make certain reports to the Department of Environmental Protection; imposing duties on the department; and repealing provisions in Title 58 of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes.
Title
Providing for operators of unconventional wells to make certain reports to the Department of Environmental Protection; imposing duties on the department; and repealing provisions in Title 58 of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-06 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | Senate | Act No. 173 |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-06-28 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2014-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2014-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-26 | House | Second consideration |
2014-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-24 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-24 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-05-29 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |