PA HB2275 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-18)
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-10-07 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-10-07 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 21, 1939 (P.L.566, No.284), known as The Pennsylvania Occupational Disease Act, providing further benefits.
Title
An Act amending the act of June 21, 1939 (P.L.566, No.284), known as The Pennsylvania Occupational Disease Act, providing further benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-10-07 | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY | |
2008-10-06 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-09-24 | Second consideration | |
2008-09-23 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-09-17 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-09-17 | Removed from table | |
2008-09-16 | Laid on the table | |
2008-09-16 | First consideration | |
2008-09-16 | Reported as amended | |
2008-02-28 | Referred to LABOR RELATIONS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2275 |