PA HB2272 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, prohibiting the Commonwealth from manufacturing or selling liquor.
Title
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, prohibiting the Commonwealth from manufacturing or selling liquor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-13 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-12 | House | Removed from table |
2022-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-08 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2022-06-08 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |