PA HB2268 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in minors, expanding the offense of use of tobacco in schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In minors, expanding the offense of use of tobacco in schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 2268 PN 3611, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A07326 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2018-06-12SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2018-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-11HouseSecond consideration
2018-06-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-05HouseRe-committed to RULES
2018-06-05HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-05HouseReported as amended
2018-04-18HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2268
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2268&pn=3384
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2268&pn=3611
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/05/2018&RollCallId=1580
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/05/2018&RollCallId=1581
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/11/2018&RollCallId=1612
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1297
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/12/2018&RollCallId=1654

Bill Comments

feedback