PA HB2222 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-24 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-24 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 8 (Boroughs and Incorporated Towns) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in contracts, further providing for regulation of contracts.
Title
In contracts, further providing for regulation of contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2222 PN 3641, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2222 PN 3641, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-10-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-10-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-0) |
2016-10-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-18 | House | Second consideration |
2016-10-17 | House | Removed from table |
2016-09-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-09-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-29 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2016-06-29 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-06-27 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |