PA HB2204 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-14 - Act No. 143
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-14 - Act No. 143
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1990 (P.L.1372, No.212), known as the Early Intervention Services System Act, further providing for definitions and for child identification, assessment and tracking system.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for child identification, assessment and tracking system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-06 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-14 | Senate | Act No. 143 |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-09 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Re-reported as amended with Prior Printer's No. 3526 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2014-06-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2014-06-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-02 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-02 | House | Second consideration |
2014-05-07 | House | Removed from table |
2014-05-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-05-06 | House | First consideration |
2014-05-06 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-05-05 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |