PA HB2203 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in vocational education, providing for an online career resource center.
Title
In vocational education, providing for an online career resource center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2203 PN 3286, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2203 PN 3286, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2018-04-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2018-04-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-18 | House | Second consideration |
2018-04-17 | House | Removed from table |
2018-04-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-04-16 | House | First consideration |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-04-09 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |