PA HB2154 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 64-1)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-08 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to conventional wells and the development of oil, gas and coal; imposing powers and duties on the Department of Environmental Protection; and providing for preliminary provisions, for general requirements, for underground gas storage, for enforcement and remedies, for related funds, parties and activities and for miscellaneous provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to conventional wells and the development of oil, gas and coal; imposing powers and duties on the Department of Environmental Protection; and providing for preliminary provisions, for general requirements, for underground gas storage, for enforcement and remedies, for related funds, parties and activities and for miscellaneous provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 2154 PN 3477, FP (Y: 111 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Floor: HB 2154 PN 3477, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, CAUSER (Y: 149 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 2154 PN 3187, 2017 A6945, MOT APPEAL CHAIR, KINSEY (Y: 107 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 2154 PN 3187, 2017 A6941, MOT APPEAL CHAIR, CARROLL (Y: 110 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 2154 PN 3187, 2017 A6979, SNYDER (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-08SenateReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
2018-06-05SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-05HouseFinal passage (111-84)
2018-05-02HouseThird consideration
2018-05-02HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-05-01HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-05-01HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-04-30HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-30HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-30HouseFirst consideration
2018-04-30HouseReported as committed
2018-03-19HouseReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2154
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2154&pn=3187
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2154&pn=3477
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=04/30/2018&RollCallId=1463
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1221
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1223
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1224
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1238
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/02/2018&RollCallId=1521
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1271

Bill Comments

feedback