PA HB2149 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 21, 1988 (P.L.1036, No.116), known as the Hardwoods Development Council Act, further providing for Hardwoods Development Council.
Title
Further providing for Hardwoods Development Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2149 PN 3698, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A04768 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2149 PN 3698, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A04768 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2020-07-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-07-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-07-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-07-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-07-07 | House | Second consideration |
2020-06-24 | House | Removed from table |
2020-06-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-23 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-04 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |