PA HB2138 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act No. 18A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act No. 18A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Supplement to the act of July 28, 1966 (3rd Sp.Sess., P.L.87, No.3), known as the University of Pittsburgh--Commonwealth Act, making appropriations for carrying the same into effect; and providing for a basis for payments of such appropriations, for a method of accounting for the funds appropriated and for certain fiscal information disclosure.
Title
A Supplement to the act of July 28, 1966 (3rd Sp.Sess., P.L.87, No.3), known as the University of Pittsburgh--Commonwealth Act, making appropriations for carrying the same into effect; and providing for a basis for payments of such appropriations, for a method of accounting for the funds appropriated and for certain fiscal information disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2138 PN 3671, CONCUR (Y: 160 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2138 PN 3671, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2138 PN 3463, FP (Y: 181 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2138 PN 3671, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2138 PN 3463, FP (Y: 181 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Act No. 18A |
2016-07-13 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-07-13 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-07-13 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-07-13 | House | Signed in House |
2016-07-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (160-30) |
2016-07-01 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-06-30 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-06-30 | House | In the House |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-06-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-06-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (181-2) |
2016-06-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-14 | House | Second consideration |
2016-06-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-08 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2016-06-08 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-06-07 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |