PA HB2106 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 27, 1991 (P.L.70, No.10), entitled "An act requiring the superintendent of every public school district to make available, upon request, lists of graduating seniors to armed forces recruiters; and providing a penalty for the misuse of any such lists," further providing for title and for legislative intent; providing for short title and for definitions; and further providing for list of seniors to be compiled, for optional compliance by nonpublic schools and for reimbursement of costs.
Title
Amending the act of June 27, 1991 (P.L.70, No.10), entitled "An act requiring the superintendent of every public school district to make available, upon request, lists of graduating seniors to armed forces recruiters; and providing a penalty for the misuse of any such lists," further providing for title and for legislative intent; providing for short title and for definitions; and further providing for list of seniors to be compiled, for optional compliance by nonpublic schools and for reimbursement of costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2014-04-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-04-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-7) |
2014-04-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-04-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-04-07 | House | Second consideration |
2014-04-02 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-01 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-01 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-03-17 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |