PA HB2102 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-07 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-07 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in juries and jurors, further providing for exemptions from jury duty and for list of disqualified jurors.
Title
In juries and jurors, further providing for exemptions from jury duty and for list of disqualified jurors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-07 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2014-10-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-10-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2014-09-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-09-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-23 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-09-15 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-03 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-03 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-03-17 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |