PA HB2100 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-15)
Status: Engrossed on September 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-16 - Third consideration and final passage (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating September 11 of each year as "September 11th Remembrance Day" in this Commonwealth; providing for the observance of "September 11th Remembrance Day" in public school entities and during public meetings; and providing for veteran recognition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating September 11 of each year as "September 11th Remembrance Day" in this Commonwealth; providing for the observance of "September 11th Remembrance Day" in public school entities and during public meetings; and providing for veteran recognition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Floor: HB 2100 PN 4380, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2100 PN 2979, 2019 A6988, POLINCHOCK (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-01 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2020-09-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-09-15HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-09-15HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-09-11HouseRemoved from table
2020-09-11HouseLaid on the table
2020-09-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-09-01HouseRe-committed to RULES
2020-09-01HouseFirst consideration
2020-09-01HouseReported as committed
2019-12-02HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2100
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2100&pn=2979
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2100&pn=4380
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=09/01/2020&RollCallId=2400
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1579
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1595
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=09/16/2020&RollCallId=2492

Bill Comments

feedback