PA HB2097 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 72 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 72 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in emergency medical services system, further providing for basic life support ambulances.
Title
In emergency medical services system, further providing for basic life support ambulances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-01 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Floor: HB 2097 PN 3248, CONCUR (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2097 PN 3248, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A04407 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2097 PN 3045, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2097 PN 2436, 2021 A3990 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Floor: HB 2097 PN 3248, CONCUR (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2097 PN 3248, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A04407 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2097 PN 3045, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2097 PN 2436, 2021 A3990 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | House | Act No. 72 of 2022 |
2022-07-11 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-07-07 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-07-06 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-07-01 | House | Signed in House |
2022-07-01 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (200-0) |
2022-07-01 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-06-30 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-06-30 | House | In the House |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-06-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2022-04-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-04-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2022-04-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-26 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-04-25 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-12 | House | First consideration |
2022-04-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-11-23 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |