PA HB2093 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-18)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-18)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the 700 to 800 block of U.S. Route 13, also known as the Chester Pike, in Prospect Park Borough, Delaware County, as the Officers Luke Arlington Conner and John Horace Callaghan Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating the 700 to 800 block of U.S. Route 13, also known as the Chester Pike, in Prospect Park Borough, Delaware County, as the Officers Luke Arlington Conner and John Horace Callaghan Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Senate | Act No. 77 |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-05-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2014-05-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-05-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-05-06 | House | Second consideration |
2014-05-05 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-29 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |