PA HB2092 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-4)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 170
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-4)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 170
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in licensing of drivers, further providing for examination of applicant for driver's license; and in commercial drivers, further providing for requirement for commercial driver's license.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for definitions; in licensing of drivers, further providing for examination of applicant for driver's license; and in commercial drivers, further providing for requirement for commercial driver's license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Act No. 170 |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-14 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-14 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-08 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (191-0) |
2014-10-08 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-08 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-08 | House | In the House |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-09-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-09-16 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2014-06-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (203-0) |
2014-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-23 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-06-19 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-29 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-03-19 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |