PA HB2070 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-03 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-03 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) and 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for Commonwealth portion of fines, etc.; defining "interactive wireless communication device"; prohibiting use of interactive wireless communication device; and further providing for duty of driver in construction and maintenance areas or on highway safety corridors, for duty of driver in emergency response areas, for accident report forms, for department to compile, tabulate and analyze accident reports and for applicability and uniformity of title.
Title
Further providing for Commonwealth portion of fines, etc.; defining "interactive wireless communication device"; prohibiting use of interactive wireless communication device; and further providing for duty of driver in construction and maintenance areas or on highway safety corridors, for duty of driver in emergency response areas, for accident report forms, for department to compile, tabulate and analyze accident reports and for applicability and uniformity of title.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-26 - House - HB 2070 PN 3134, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 189 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - House - HB 2070 PN 2883, 2009 A5169, CLYMER (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - House - HB 2070 PN 2883, 2009 A5169, CLYMER (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-03 | Laid on the table | |
2010-06-16 | Removed from table | |
2010-06-16 | Laid on the table | |
2010-05-05 | Removed from table | |
2010-05-05 | Laid on the table | |
2010-04-21 | Second consideration | |
2010-03-23 | First consideration | |
2010-03-23 | Reported as amended | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION | |
2010-01-26 | In the Senate | |
2010-01-26 | Final passage | |
2010-01-26 | Third consideration, with amendments | |
2010-01-25 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2010-01-25 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-11-10 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-11-10 | Removed from table | |
2009-11-10 | Laid on the table | |
2009-11-10 | First consideration | |
2009-11-10 | Reported as amended | |
2009-11-09 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |