PA HB2045 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Act No. 60
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act authorizing the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to Ohiopyle Borough, Fayette County, certain lands situate in Ohiopyle Borough, Fayette County, in exchange for Ohiopyle Borough granting and conveying certain lands to the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to be added to those existing lands at Ohiopyle State Park.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to Ohiopyle Borough, Fayette County, certain lands situate in Ohiopyle Borough, Fayette County, in exchange for Ohiopyle Borough granting and conveying certain lands to the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to be added to those existing lands at Ohiopyle State Park.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2045 PN 2872, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 2045 PN 2872, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-14SenateAct No. 60
2020-07-14SenateApproved by the Governor
2020-07-07SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-07-07SenateSigned in House
2020-06-30SenateSigned in Senate
2020-06-30SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-06-22SenateSecond consideration
2020-06-08SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-08SenateReported as committed
2020-05-07SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2020-05-05SenateIn the Senate
2020-05-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2020-05-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-04-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-04-07HouseSecond consideration
2020-04-06HouseRemoved from table
2020-02-04HouseLaid on the table
2020-02-04HouseFirst consideration
2020-02-04HouseReported as committed
2020-02-03HouseRe-referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2020-02-03HouseReported with request to re-refer to STATE GOVERNMENT
2019-11-14HouseReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2045
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2045&pn=2872
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=01/13/2020&RollCallId=1575
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=02/04/2020&RollCallId=1717
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1252
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/05/2020&RollCallId=1935
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=06/08/2020&RollCallId=921
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=577

Bill Comments

feedback