PA HB2040 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing public school districts to implement a senior tax reduction incentive volunteer exchange program.
Title
Authorizing public school districts to implement a senior tax reduction incentive volunteer exchange program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Finance: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Finance: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-09-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-13 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2018-06-13 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-04-17 | House | Re-referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |
2018-04-17 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to FINANCE |