PA HB2025 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-13)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act No. 165
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-13)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act No. 165
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in registration of vehicles, further providing for temporary registration cards, for display of registration plate and for surrender of registration plates and cards upon suspension or revocation and providing for suspension of registration upon unpaid tolls; in commercial drivers, further providing for commercial driver's license; in fees, further providing for trucks and truck tractors and for reinstatement of operating privilege or vehicle registration; in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for the offense of homicide by vehicle and for the offense of aggravated assault by vehicle; in inspection of vehicles, further providing for requirement for periodic inspection of vehicles, for limited liability of inspection station or mechanic, for suspension of certificates of appointment and for certification of mechanics; in size, weight and load, further providing for permit for movement during course of manufacture; and, in abandoned vehicles and cargo, further providing for reports by private property owners of abandoned vehicles.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for definitions; in registration of vehicles, further providing for temporary registration cards, for display of registration plate and for surrender of registration plates and cards upon suspension or revocation and providing for suspension of registration upon unpaid tolls; in commercial drivers, further providing for commercial driver's license; in fees, further providing for trucks and truck tractors and for reinstatement of operating privilege or vehicle registration; in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for the offense of homicide by vehicle and for the offense of aggravated assault by vehicle; in inspection of vehicles, further providing for requirement for periodic inspection of vehicles, for limited liability of inspection station or mechanic, for suspension of certificates of appointment and for certification of mechanics; in size, weight and load, further providing for permit for movement during course of manufacture; and, in abandoned vehicles and cargo, further providing for reports by private property owners of abandoned vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2025 PN 4069, CONCUR (Y: 123 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - House - House Rules: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A10681 (Y: 0 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-10-25 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A10682 (Y: 0 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-10-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2025 PN 4069, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2025 PN 4069, A10700, SABATINA AMENDMENT NO. A-10700 (Y: 17 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House Floor: HB 2025 PN 3352, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A07209 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - House - House Rules: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A10681 (Y: 0 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-10-25 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A10682 (Y: 0 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-10-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2025 PN 4069, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2025 PN 4069, A10700, SABATINA AMENDMENT NO. A-10700 (Y: 17 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House Floor: HB 2025 PN 3352, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A07209 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | House | Act No. 165 |
2016-11-04 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-10-27 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-26 | House | Signed in House |
2016-10-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (123-71) |
2016-10-25 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-10-25 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-10-24 | House | In the House |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Amended on second consideration |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-07-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2016-05-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-05-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2016-05-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-05-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-05-18 | House | Second consideration |
2016-05-17 | House | Removed from table |
2016-05-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-05-16 | House | First consideration |
2016-05-16 | House | Reported as amended |
2016-04-29 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |