PA HB2022 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-01 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-01 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 26, 1931 (P.L.1379, No.348), referred to as the Third Class County Assessment Board Law, further providing for appeals by municipalities.
Title
Further providing for appeals by municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-25 - House - HB 2022 PN 3709, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 190 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-01 | Referred to FINANCE | |
2010-05-25 | In the Senate | |
2010-05-25 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-05-24 | Second consideration | |
2010-05-24 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-05-05 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-05-05 | Removed from table | |
2010-05-04 | Laid on the table | |
2010-05-04 | First consideration | |
2010-05-04 | Reported as amended | |
2009-10-06 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |