PA HB2017 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 48-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in corporate net income tax, further providing for definitions.
Title
In corporate net income tax, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor: HB 2017 PN 2998, FP (Y: 183 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2017 PN 2998, 2017 A5954, CUTLER, GERMANE (Y: 75 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A05666 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor: HB 2017 PN 2998, FP (Y: 183 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2017 PN 2998, 2017 A5954, CUTLER, GERMANE (Y: 75 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A05666 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-03-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2018-03-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (183-4) |
2018-03-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-03-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-03-13 | House | Second consideration |
2018-03-12 | House | Removed from table |
2018-02-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-02-06 | House | First consideration |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to FINANCE |