PA HB2012 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-12 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-12 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 4 (Amusements) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in gaming, further providing for licensing of principals and for financial and employment interests.
Title
In gaming, further providing for licensing of principals and for financial and employment interests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-07 - House - HB 2012 PN 2820, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-12-05 - House - HB 2012 PN 2630, 2011 A6089, DAY (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-12-05 - House - HB 2012 PN 2630, 2011 A6089, DAY (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-12 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2011-12-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-12-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2011-12-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-12-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-12-05 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2011-11-01 | House | Removed from table |
2011-10-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-10-25 | House | First consideration |
2011-10-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-10-04 | House | Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT |