PA HB2003 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-07 - Act No. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-07 - Act No. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission and the Governor, to grant and convey to the Southern Lancaster County Historical Society certain lands situate in Fulton Township, Lancaster County; and authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey a certain tract of land and improvements thereon in Lower Oxford Township, Chester County.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission and the Governor, to grant and convey to the Southern Lancaster County Historical Society certain lands situate in Fulton Township, Lancaster County; and authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey a certain tract of land and improvements thereon in Lower Oxford Township, Chester County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 2003 PN 3536, CONCUR (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2003 PN 3536, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 2003 PN 3211, FP (Y: 188 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2003 PN 3536, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 2003 PN 3211, FP (Y: 188 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-07 | House | Act No. 66 |
2016-07-07 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-06-29 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-06-29 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-06-28 | House | Signed in House |
2016-06-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (198-0) |
2016-06-28 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-06-27 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-06-23 | House | In the House |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2016-05-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-05-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-3) |
2016-05-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-05-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-05-24 | House | Second consideration |
2016-05-23 | House | Removed from table |
2016-05-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-05-17 | House | First consideration |
2016-05-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |