PA HB1991 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, further providing for intergovernmental cooperation.
Title
Further providing for intergovernmental cooperation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-18 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Removed from table |
2016-10-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-07-11 | House | Removed from table |
2016-07-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-08 | House | Removed from table |
2016-05-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-05-18 | House | First consideration |
2016-05-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |