PA HB1985 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Act No. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Act No. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of sex offenders, further providing for legislative findings and declaration of policy, for definitions, for applicability, for sexual offenses and tier system, for period of registration and for assessments.
Title
In registration of sex offenders, further providing for legislative findings and declaration of policy, for definitions, for applicability, for sexual offenses and tier system, for period of registration and for assessments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | Senate | Act No. 19 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-03-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2014-02-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-02-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (179-0) |
2014-02-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-02-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-02-04 | House | Second consideration |
2014-01-29 | House | Removed from table |
2014-01-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-01-28 | House | First consideration |
2014-01-28 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |